Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/01/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/08/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/08/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/10/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/10/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/10/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/10/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/01/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/01/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/02/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/02/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/02/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/02/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/02/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/03/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/03/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/03/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/09/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/09/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/09/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/09/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/10/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/10/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/17/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/17/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/17/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/14/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/03/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/27/2006