There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Livestock Mandatory Reporting Act of 1999 and to amend the swine reporting provisions of that Act.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/05/2006Became Public Law No: 109-296. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2006Signed by President.
09/27/2006Presented to President.
09/20/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/2006Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9852-9853)
09/14/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7875-7876)
07/22/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
10/05/2006Became Public Law No: 109-296. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2006Signed by President.
09/27/2006HousePresented to President.
09/20/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/20/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/2006SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9852-9853)
10/07/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
09/15/2005SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/14/2005-10:35amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/14/2005-10:35amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7875-7876)
09/14/2005-10:30amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3408.
09/14/2005-10:30amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7875-7877)
09/14/2005-10:30amHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/27/2005HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/27/2005HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/26/2005HouseExecutive Comment Requested from USDA.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/22/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
07/22/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/14/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture07/22/2005 Referred to
07/27/2005 Markup by
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry10/07/2005 Referred to
09/20/2006 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3408. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-296 (10/05/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on September 14, 2006. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946 to extend the provisions of the Livestock Mandatory Price Reporting Act of 1999 through September 30, 2010.

Amends swine price reporting provisions.