Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/25/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/25/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/25/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/25/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/25/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/27/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/18/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/28/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/09/2006