There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Lyme and Tick-borne Disease Prevention, Education, and Research Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the expansion of Federal efforts concerning the prevention, education, treatment, and research activities related to Lyme and other tick-borne diseases, including the establishment of a Tick-Borne Diseases Advisory Committee.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
08/05/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/26/2005Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/03/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/07/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/07/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/07/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/02/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/02/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/02/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/02/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/03/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/03/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/03/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/04/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/09/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/11/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/11/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/16/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/23/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/24/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/24/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/06/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/06/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/06/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/09/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/19/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/21/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/11/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/11/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/18/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/12/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/25/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/27/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/27/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/05/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/05/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/26/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health08/05/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3427. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2005)

Lyme and Tick-borne Disease Prevention, Education, and Research Act of 2005 - Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish the Tick-Borne Diseases Advisory Committee. Requires the Committee to advise the Secretary and the Assistant Secretary for Health regarding how officials can: (1) ensure interagency coordination and communication and minimize overlap regarding efforts to address tick-borne diseases; (2) identify opportunities to coordinate efforts with other federal agencies and private organizations addressing such diseases; (3) ensure interagency coordination and communication with constituency groups; (4) ensure that a broad spectrum of scientific viewpoints is represented in public heath policy decisions and that information disseminated to the public and physicians is balanced; and (5) advise relevant federal agencies on priorities related to Lyme and tick-borne diseases.

Requires the Secretary, acting through the appropriate federal officials, to provide for the coordination of all federal programs and activities related to Lyme and other tick-borne diseases, including: (1) developing sensitive and accurate diagnostic tools and tests, (2) improving the efficient utilization of diagnostic testing currently available; (3) accurately determining the prevalence of such diseases; (4) evaluating the feasibility of creating a national uniform reporting system; (5) providing and promoting access to a clearinghouse of information on such diseases; (6) increasing public education related to such diseases; (7) creating a physician education program; (8) establishing epidemiological research objectives to determine the long term course of illness for Lyme disease; and (9) determining the effectiveness of different treatment modalities by establishing treatment outcome objectives