Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/29/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/20/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/02/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/04/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/20/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/20/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/28/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/28/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/07/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/07/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/13/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/20/2006