Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/07/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/26/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/14/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/28/2006