Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/14/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/27/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/12/2006