Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/25/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/28/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/01/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/10/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/31/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 01/31/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/08/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/08/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/14/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/14/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/14/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/15/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/16/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/28/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/01/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/01/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/07/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/07/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/07/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/07/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/07/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/08/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/08/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/08/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/09/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/14/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/28/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/04/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/05/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/06/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/25/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/25/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/25/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/26/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/02/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/02/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/02/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/09/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/16/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/07/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/07/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/07/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/15/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/25/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/28/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/14/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/14/2006