Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/27/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/27/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/28/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/29/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/07/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/04/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/04/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/31/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/31/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/31/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/15/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/11/2006