Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/20/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/20/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/20/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/20/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/20/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/20/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/20/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/22/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/25/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/27/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 10/27/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/02/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/03/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/15/2005