Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/16/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/16/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/16/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/07/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/09/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/10/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/02/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/01/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/01/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/01/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/06/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/06/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/06/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/30/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/30/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/22/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/11/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/25/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/13/2006