Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/08/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/18/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/18/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/18/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/28/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 10/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/28/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/04/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/17/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 11/17/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/17/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/01/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/01/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/01/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/01/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/08/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/08/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/08/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/08/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/08/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/08/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/02/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/02/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/02/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/02/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/02/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/02/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/02/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/02/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/16/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/16/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/16/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/30/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/30/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/30/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/27/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/10/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/10/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/10/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/10/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/19/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/25/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/13/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/16/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/10/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/10/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/10/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/10/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/20/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/28/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/07/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/07/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/14/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/21/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 12/05/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/06/2006