Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/25/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/26/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/26/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/26/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/26/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/26/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/08/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/08/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/15/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/15/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/15/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/03/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/18/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/18/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/18/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/22/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/01/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/01/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/01/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/07/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/07/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/14/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/30/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/25/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/17/2006