Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/29/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/29/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/29/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/29/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/29/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/29/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/29/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/29/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/29/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/29/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/29/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/29/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/29/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/29/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/29/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/08/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/08/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/14/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/15/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/15/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/15/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/15/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/15/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/15/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/15/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/15/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/20/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/28/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/29/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/06/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/07/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/17/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/18/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/19/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/19/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/19/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/19/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/19/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/19/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/20/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/24/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/01/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/01/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/02/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/07/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/20/2006