Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2006