There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that no Federal funds may be expended for the payment or reimbursement of drugs when prescribed for the treatment of erectile or sexual dysfunction.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/28/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
09/19/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/15/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/05/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
08/04/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Resources, International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Resources, International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Resources, International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Resources, International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Resources, International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Resources, International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Resources, International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Resources, International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Resources, International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (8)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/28/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health08/05/2005 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/28/2005 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade08/04/2005 Referred to
House Government Reform07/28/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services07/28/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs07/28/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health08/15/2005 Referred to
House Resources07/28/2005 Referred to
House International Relations07/28/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary07/28/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security09/19/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3566. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/2005)

Prohibits the expenditure of federal funds for payment or reimbursement for a drug prescribed for the treatment of erectile or sexual dysfunction, including under any federal health care program (including Medicare, Medicaid, health-related programs administered by the Indian Health Service, the federal employees health benefits program, military health programs, medical care furnished by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and medical services for federal prisoners).