Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/07/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/07/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/27/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/02/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/16/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/04/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/19/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/14/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/14/2006