Refine your search

10 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/22/2005 Became Public Law No: 109-146.
12/22/2005 Signed by President.
12/19/2005 Presented to President.
12/18/2005 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H12189-12190)
11/18/2005 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/18/2005 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/27/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5184)
06/17/2005 Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
06/15/2005 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 109-134, Part I.
01/25/2005 Introduced in House