Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/06/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/06/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/06/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/06/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/06/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/06/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/06/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/16/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/09/2006