Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/28/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/28/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/07/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/17/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/06/2006