Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/29/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/13/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/27/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/07/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/07/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/25/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/26/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/26/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/10/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/10/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/10/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/10/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/10/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/10/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/15/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/15/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/08/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/08/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 12/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/08/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/08/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/15/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/01/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/28/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/08/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/20/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/29/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/11/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/13/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/27/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/20/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/29/2006