Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 07/29/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/06/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/06/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/06/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/14/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/21/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/21/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/27/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/27/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/06/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 10/06/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/17/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/17/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/20/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/13/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/14/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/13/2006