Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/29/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/14/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/14/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/14/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/22/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/28/2005