Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 07/29/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/29/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/02/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/16/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/16/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/16/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/16/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/01/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/01/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/04/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/06/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/06/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/09/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/07/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/25/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/25/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/25/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/26/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/26/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/13/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/14/2006