There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Keep Our PACT Act
Keep Our Promise to America's Children and Teachers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require full funding of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 and the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/25/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
03/24/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Education Reform.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
01/25/2005Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2005Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2005Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/02/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/19/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/19/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/07/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/19/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/08/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/15/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/15/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/27/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/28/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/01/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/07/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/07/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/14/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/14/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/25/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/12/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/13/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce01/25/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Education Reform03/24/2005 Referred to
House Appropriations01/25/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.363.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.363. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/25/2005)

Keep Our Promise to America's Children and Teachers Act - Keep Our PACT Act - Makes appropriations in order to provide for the full funding of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965, as amended by the No Child Left Behind Act of 2001 (ESEA-NCLBA), and for the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (IDEA).

Makes such appropriations for ESEA-NCLBA programs in amounts for each of FY 2006 through 2011 which equal the difference between other appropriations and specified amounts for each of those fiscal years.

Amends IDEA to authorize and make appropriations for: (1) each of FY 2006 through 2011 in specified amounts; and (2) for FY 2012 and each subsequent fiscal year, in the amount that is the total for all States of the maximum amounts necessary to fully fund 40 percent of the average per pupil expenditure for IDEA part B programs of assistance for education of all children with disabilities.