Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/02/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/19/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/19/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/07/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/19/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/08/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/15/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/15/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/27/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/28/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/01/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/07/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/07/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/14/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/14/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/25/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/12/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/13/2006