Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/26/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/26/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/26/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/27/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/03/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/07/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/18/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/10/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/31/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/10/2006