Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/29/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/22/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/29/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/06/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/02/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 11/02/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/07/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/16/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/15/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/15/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/16/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/05/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/11/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2006