Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 09/06/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/06/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 09/06/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 09/06/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/07/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/07/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/08/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/15/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/15/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/15/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/25/2006