Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/06/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/09/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/09/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 12/16/2005