Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/28/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/28/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/09/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/14/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/14/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/14/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/15/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/15/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/15/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/28/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/28/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/28/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/30/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/04/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/04/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/03/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/03/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/17/2006