Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/08/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/27/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/01/2005