Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/04/2005 Became Public Law No: 109-84.
10/04/2005 Signed by President.
09/29/2005 Presented to President.
09/27/2005 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2005 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10480)
09/21/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8176)
09/07/2005 Introduced in House