Text: H.R.3670 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/07/2005)


109th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 3670


To extend for persons affected by Hurricane Katrina the time for appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for Veterans Claims of certain decisions of the Board of Veterans Appeals that are rendered during the period from June 1, 2005, through November 30, 2005.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

September 7, 2005

Mr. Evans (for himself, Mr. Filner, Mr. Gutierrez, Ms. Corrine Brown of Florida, Mr. Snyder, Mr. Michaud, Ms. Herseth, Mr. Strickland, Ms. Hooley, Mr. Reyes, Ms. Berkley, Mr. Udall of New Mexico, and Mrs. Davis of California) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Veterans’ Affairs


A BILL

To extend for persons affected by Hurricane Katrina the time for appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for Veterans Claims of certain decisions of the Board of Veterans Appeals that are rendered during the period from June 1, 2005, through November 30, 2005.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Extension for persons affected by Hurricane Katrina of time for appeal of certain decisions rendered by Board of Veterans Appeals.

(a) Appeal period.—Section 7266(a) of title 38, United States Code, shall be applied in the case of a person who is a Hurricane Katrina-affected person by substituting “240 days” for “120 days” with respect to any decision of the Board of Veterans Appeals that is rendered during the period beginning on June 1, 2005, and ending on November 30, 2005.

(b) Hurricane Katrina-affected person defined.—For purposes of this section, the term “Hurricane Katrina-affected person” means a person—

(1) who as of August 28, 2005, resided in a county identified as being adversely affected by Hurricane Katrina in the State of Florida, Louisiana, Mississippi, or Alabama by Federal Disaster Declaration notice 1602, 1603, 1604, or 1605, respectively (as amended), issued by the Federal Emergency Management Agency; or

(2) whose claim is under the jurisdiction of the Department of Veterans Affairs regional office in New Orleans, Louisiana, or Jackson, Mississippi.