Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/27/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/18/2005