Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/07/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/08/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/08/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/14/2006