Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 09/07/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/21/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/21/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/19/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/26/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/31/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew