Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/07/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/07/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/08/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/08/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/13/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/28/2006