Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/29/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 11/17/2005