Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/15/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/15/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/29/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/18/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/18/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/18/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/18/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/18/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/19/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/25/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/27/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/16/2005