Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/26/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/15/2005