There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to remove the Peace Corps as an option for service under the National Call to Service military recruitment program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/08/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/20/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
09/08/2005Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/08/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/20/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/20/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/06/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/06/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/01/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/15/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/15/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/06/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services09/08/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel09/20/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3709.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3709. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/08/2005)

Removes the Peace Corps as an option for service under the National Call to Service military recruitment program.