Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/20/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/20/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/06/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/06/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/01/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/15/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/15/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/06/2005