Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/08/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/15/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/08/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/12/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/13/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/13/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/13/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/19/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/19/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/03/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/03/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/09/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/12/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/24/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/07/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/07/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/20/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/07/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/06/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/18/2005