Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/14/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/15/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/21/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/21/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/27/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/27/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/07/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/19/2005