Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/08/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/22/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/29/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/29/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/29/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/19/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/19/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/01/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/04/2006