Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/03/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/03/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/03/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/03/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/03/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/03/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/03/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/03/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/03/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/03/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/03/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/03/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/03/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/03/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/03/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/03/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/03/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/03/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/03/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/03/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/03/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/03/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/03/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/03/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/03/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 10/03/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/03/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/03/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/03/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/03/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 10/25/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/25/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/25/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/28/2006