Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/15/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/15/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/15/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/15/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/15/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/15/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/15/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/26/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/26/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/26/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/27/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/27/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/06/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/18/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/09/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/09/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/09/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/09/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/08/2005