Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/14/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/14/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/14/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/15/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/07/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/08/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/07/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/07/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/07/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/07/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/19/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/28/2006