Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/14/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/14/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/19/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/19/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/19/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/19/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/19/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/19/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/19/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/19/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/19/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/19/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/26/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/26/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/26/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/26/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/26/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/26/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/26/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/29/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/29/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/29/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/06/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/07/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/07/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/28/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/29/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/27/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/14/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/15/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/22/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/22/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/27/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/29/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/11/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/13/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/20/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/24/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/25/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/28/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/28/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/06/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/07/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/07/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/25/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/13/2006